Epsilon Football League 04-27-2036 |
||
#46 | Derek
Bush |
CB
Retired (1992, Age 32) |
---|
BIOGRAPHICAL DATA | |||
---|---|---|---|
Total Rating | Total rating is based on a weighted average of ability scores. It does not determine player worth and should not be used in lieu of examination of a particular player's ratings. However, it can give a general idea of a player's ability level across other skills.
Each position weighs different factors into its overall rating; these are shown in bold on the roster display. |
Conditioning | 95% |
Status | Retired (1992) | Potential | |
Age | 75 | Born | 09-13-1960 in Williamson, WV |
Drafted | Round 6, Pick 91 (1983) | Experience | 7 Years (131 Wks) |
College | Hawaii University, 1982 | Salary | 745 ($4.93M/2036 $) |
OFFENSE | DEFENSE | SPEC TEAMS | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Throw Power | Catching | Pass Cover | Kick Power | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Throw Acc | Pass Blocking | Run Cover | Kick Acc | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Carrying | Run Blocking | Tackling | Kick Return | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Pursuit | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
PHYSICAL | MENTAL | DEXTERITY | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Speed | Stamina | Execution | Agility | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Strength | Health | Aggressiveness | Hands | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jumping | Attitude | Break Tackle | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
ROLES | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
Year | Team | G | GS | TKL | SOLO | AST | SACK | SAF | STF | DEF | BRK | INT | INTY | AVG | LNG | TD | FF |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1984 | TUL | 12 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 1 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
1985 | TUL | 11 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | 0 | 0 |
1986 | TUL | 16 | 15 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 3 | 0 | 3 | 39 | 13.0 | 16 | 0 | 0 |
1987 | TUL | 16 | 16 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 6 | 3 | 3 | 51 | 17.0 | 51 | 1 | 0 |
1988 | TUL | 16 | 5 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 3 | 1 | 2 | 15 | 7.5 | 14 | 0 | 0 |
1989 | TUL | 16 | 15 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 2 | 1 | 1 | 15 | 15.0 | 15 | 0 | 0 |
1990 | TUL | 10 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Total | 97 | 52 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0.0 | 0 | 0.0 | 15 | 5 | 10 | 120 | 12.0 | 51 | 1 | 0 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1992 | Derek Bush has retired from football. |
09-08-1991 | The Tulsa Toasters have automatically waived Derek Bush to comply with the salary cap limit. |
08-05-1991 | The Tulsa Toasters have moved Derrick Smith, Brian Kenbow, Jimmy Heffernan, Ken Nichols, Jim Scioli, and Doug Lynch to the active roster. The Tulsa Toasters have moved Howard Grossman, Jim Howell, Derek Bush, Paul Shurtliffe, and Rodney Youso to the inactive roster. |
10-15-1990 | The Tulsa Toasters have moved Antonio Walters, Derek Bush, and Joe Paul to the active roster. The Tulsa Toasters have moved Jim Monahan, Fred Wright, and Ron Wilcox to the inactive roster. |
08-12-1990 | The Tulsa Toasters have moved Dale Thomas, Jake Tate, Jim Monahan, Jack Tate, George Ledbetter, and Marc Coons to the active roster. The Tulsa Toasters have moved Dick Missouri, Gene Wilkerson, Derek Bush, Julian Conjar, Fulton Kostiuk, and Michael Konrad to the inactive roster. |
08-27-1984 | The Tulsa Toasters have moved Derek Bush and Ron Hatchette to the active roster. |
08-06-1984 | The Tulsa Toasters have acquired Derek Bush from the waiver wire. |
09-11-1983 | The Tulsa Toasters have automatically waived Derek Bush to comply with the 53-man roster limit. |