Epsilon Football League 04-27-2036 |
||
#80 | George
Mark |
WR
Retired (1990, Age 25) |
---|
BIOGRAPHICAL DATA | |||
---|---|---|---|
Total Rating | Total rating is based on a weighted average of ability scores. It does not determine player worth and should not be used in lieu of examination of a particular player's ratings. However, it can give a general idea of a player's ability level across other skills.
Each position weighs different factors into its overall rating; these are shown in bold on the roster display. |
Conditioning | 95% |
Status | Deceased (01-02-2026) | Potential | |
Age at Death | 60 | Born | 06-05-1965 in Norman, OK |
Drafted | Round 6, Pick 93 (1988) | Experience | 0 Years (7 Wks) |
College | Portland University, 1987 | Salary | 310 ($2.051M/2036 $) |
OFFENSE | DEFENSE | SPEC TEAMS | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Throw Power | Catching | Pass Cover | Kick Power | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Throw Acc | Pass Blocking | Run Cover | Kick Acc | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Carrying | Run Blocking | Tackling | Kick Return | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Pursuit | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
PHYSICAL | MENTAL | DEXTERITY | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Speed | Stamina | Execution | Agility | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Strength | Health | Aggressiveness | Hands | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jumping | Attitude | Break Tackle | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
ROLES | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
Year | Team | G | GS | TARG | REC | PCT | YDS | AVG | LNG | YAC | YACA | TD | YDS/G | 1ST | 1ST% | DP |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1988 | SF | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 |
Total | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 | -- | 0 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
08-07-1989 | The San Francisco Sommelier have waived George Mark. |
09-25-1988 | The San Francisco Sommelier have moved Barry Cain, Nick Fifer, and Ken Shonk to the active roster. The San Francisco Sommelier have moved Reggie Helvie, George Mark, and Chris Tofil to the inactive roster. |
08-08-1988 | The San Francisco Sommelier have moved George Mark and John Shaw to the active roster. The San Francisco Sommelier have moved Carl Korver and Ken Shonk to the inactive roster. |